Ms.POONAM BANSAL | CIVIL JUDGE (SENIOR DIVISION) | 15/04/2015 to 28/04/2016
|
Sh. AMRINDER PAL SINGH | CIVIL JUDGE (SENIOR DIVISION) | 29/04/2016 to 11/05/2017
|
Sh. HARSIMRANJIT SINGH | CIVIL JUDGE (SENIOR DIVISION | 12/05/2017 to 01/05/2018
|
Ms. MONICA SHARMA | CIVIL JUDGE (SENIOR DIVISION) | 02/05/2018 to 08/04/2021
|
Sh. Rupinder Singh | Civil Judge (Senior Division) | 10/04/2021 to 25/04/2024
|
MS. ARCHNA PURI | CHIEF JUDICIAL MAGISTRATE | 15/05/1999 to 01/06/2001
|
MS. HARVEEN BHAERDWAJ | CHIEF JUDICIAL MAGISTRATE | 07/06/2001 to 05/06/2004
|
SH. K. C. CHEEMA | CHIEF JUDICIAL MAGISTRATE | 06/06/2003 to 31/05/2005
|
SH. KISHORE KUMAR | CHIEF JUDICIAL MAGISTRATE | 01/06/2005 to 17/08/2005
|
SH. JATINDER PAL SINGH | CHIEF JUDICIAL MAGISTRATE | 18/08/2005 to 01/06/2006
|
SH. RAJIV MALHOTRA | CHIEF JUDICIAL MAGISTRATE | 02/06/2006 to 12/03/2008
|
MS. PREETI SAHNI | CHIEF JUDICIAL MAGISTRATE | 12/03/2008 to 26/11/2008
|
SH. GURJANT SINGH | CHIEF JUDICIAL MAGISTRATE | 01/12/2008 to 01/04/2011
|
MS. GURMIT KAUR | CHIEF JUDICIAL MAGISTRATE | 01/04/2011 to 23/05/2011
|
SH. RAM KUMAR | CHIEF JUDICIAL MAGISTRATE | 13/06/2011 to 06/08/2012
|
MS. LUKHVINDER KAUR | CHIEF JUDICIAL MAGISTRATE | 06/08/2012 to 12/11/2012
|
SH. TARN TATAN SINGH BINDRA | CHIEF JUDICIAL MAGISTRATE | 12/11/2012 to 16/09/2013
|
MS. POONAM BANSAL | CHIEF JUDICIAL MAGISTRATE | 17/09/2013 to 15/04/2015
|
SH.AMRINDER PAL SINGH | CHIEF JUDICIAL MAGISTRATE | 15/04/2015 to 28/04/2016
|
SH. HARSIMRANJIT SINGH | CHIEF JUDICIAL MAGISTRATE | 29/04/2016 to 11/05/2017
|